LA HB410 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to exemption from requirements regarding selection of professional services contracts (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to exemption from requirements regarding selection of professional services contracts (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Brass [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - House Vote on HB 410 FINAL PASSAGE (#69) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-21 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 9. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/21/2024. |
2024-03-20 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported with amendments (23-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |