LA HB42 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to membership in the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (RE1 INCREASE APV)
Title
Provides relative to membership in the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (RE1 INCREASE APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 42 FINAL PASSAGE (#410) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 19. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2024. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-01-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2024. |
2024-01-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-01-26 | House | Prefiled. |