LA HB423 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date: 06/23/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Effective date: 06/23/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the secretary of the Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality to establish and administer a water quality trading program
Title
Authorizes the secretary of the Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality to establish and administer a water quality trading program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 423 ADOPT (#924) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 423 MOTION TO ADOPT (#909) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 423 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#708) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 423 FINAL PASSAGE (#590) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 423 FINAL PASSAGE (#336) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 423 MOTION TO ADOPT (#909) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 423 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#708) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 423 FINAL PASSAGE (#590) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 423 FINAL PASSAGE (#336) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | House | Effective date: 06/23/17. |
2017-06-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 371. |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-07 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2017-06-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/17. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2017-06-05 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2017-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Walsworth, Fannin, and Donahue. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2017-06-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Leopold, Bishop, and Garofalo. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2017-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/17. |
2017-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/17. |
2017-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |