LA HB521 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Reported favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the use of genetic information relative to life and long-term care insurance
Title
Prohibits the use of genetic information relative to life and long-term care insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 521 FINAL PASSAGE (#501) (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 6. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |