LA HB525 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-20 - Effective date: 06/20/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-20 - Effective date: 06/20/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the transfer of certain state property in Caddo Parish
Title
Provides for the transfer of certain state property in Caddo Parish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 525 FINAL PASSAGE (#1237) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 525 FINAL PASSAGE (#146) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 525 FINAL PASSAGE (#146) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | House | Effective date: 06/20/2022. |
2022-06-20 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 732. |
2022-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-03-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2022. |
2022-03-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported favorably (11-0-1). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2022-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |