LA HB528 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of New Orleans to create a municipal revenue amnesty program (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes the city of New Orleans to create a municipal revenue amnesty program (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 528 ADOPT (#1089) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 528 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1080) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 528 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#960) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 528 FINAL PASSAGE (#903) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 528 FINAL PASSAGE (#529) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 528 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1080) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 528 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#960) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 528 FINAL PASSAGE (#903) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 528 FINAL PASSAGE (#529) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2015. |
2015-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 408. |
2015-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015. |
2015-06-11 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-11 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2015-06-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/11/2015. |
2015-06-10 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2015-06-09 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Riser, Murray, and Adley. |
2015-06-09 | House | House conferees appointed: Leger, Badon, and Moreno. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2015-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015. |
2015-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-06-06 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/27/2015. |
2015-05-19 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-18 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2015-04-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2015-04-03 | House | Prefiled. |