LA HB549 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-13-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Effective date: July 12, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-13-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Effective date: July 12, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the La. Granting Resources and Autonomy for Diplomas Act, including additional operational autonomies to be granted to public postsecondary education institutions and reporting requirements for such institutions and the Board of Regents (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the La. Granting Resources and Autonomy for Diplomas Act, including additional operational autonomies to be granted to public postsecondary education institutions and reporting requirements for such institutions and the Board of Regents (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 549, ADOPT (#1041) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Vote on HB 549, MOTION TO ADOPT (#944) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - House Vote on HB 549, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#901) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 549, FINAL PASSAGE (#776) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 549, FINAL PASSAGE (#112) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Vote on HB 549, MOTION TO ADOPT (#944) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - House Vote on HB 549, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#901) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 549, FINAL PASSAGE (#776) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 549, FINAL PASSAGE (#112) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | Effective date: July 12, 2011. | |
2011-07-12 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 418. | |
2011-06-24 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24. | |
2011-06-23 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-23 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2011-06-23 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 5 nays. | |
2011-06-23 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2011-06-23 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2011-06-22 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2011-06-22 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Nevers, Chaisson, and Appel. | |
2011-06-22 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2011-06-22 | House conferees appointed: Tucker, Austin Badon, and Downs. | |
2011-06-22 | Notice House rejected Senate amendments. | |
2011-06-22 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. | |
2011-06-22 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-06-21 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/22/2011. | |
2011-06-21 | Notice given. | |
2011-06-21 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-06-20 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2011. | |
2011-06-20 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-16 | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 06/20. | |
2011-06-16 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-15 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-14 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-14 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-13 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-05-16 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2011-05-12 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2011-05-11 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/11/2011. | |
2011-05-05 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-04 | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled. |