LA HB562 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the boundaries of the New Orleans Exhibition Hall Authority Economic Growth and Development District
Title
Provides relative to the boundaries of the New Orleans Exhibition Hall Authority Economic Growth and Development District
Sponsors
Rep. Alonzo Knox [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 562 FINAL PASSAGE (#452) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2024. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |