LA HB588 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to Medicaid services
Title
Provides relative to Medicaid services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Withdrawn from the files of the House. |
2021-04-22 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |