LA HB593 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 1:00 pm in Room F
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 1:00 pm in Room F
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to residency requirements for employees of the New Orleans sewerage and water board (RE INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to residency requirements for employees of the New Orleans sewerage and water board (RE INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 593 FINAL PASSAGE (#454) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2024. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |