LA HB603 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to claims of pharmacies and pharmacists
Title
Provides relative to claims of pharmacies and pharmacists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 603 FINAL PASSAGE (#651) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 603 FINAL PASSAGE (#651) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 603 FINAL PASSAGE (#651) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 14. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/2024. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported with amendments (12-4). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |