LA HB639 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the refusal of an operator of a motor vehicle to provide identification to an officer
Title
Provides relative to the refusal of an operator of a motor vehicle to provide identification to an officer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 639 FINAL PASSAGE (#502) (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 639 FINAL PASSAGE (#502) (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 639 FINAL PASSAGE (#502) (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported favorably (9-3). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |