LA HB674 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a local governing authority to adopt ordinances to address blighted property with purported collector's automobiles
Title
Authorizes a local governing authority to adopt ordinances to address blighted property with purported collector's automobiles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 674 FINAL PASSAGE (#317) (Y: 84 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 17. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/08/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |