LA HB681 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date: January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date: January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the definition of alternative fuel for purposes of the tax credit for conversion of a vehicle to alternative fuel usage (EN INCREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
Changes the definition of alternative fuel for purposes of the tax credit for conversion of a vehicle to alternative fuel usage (EN INCREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 681 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#962) (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 681 FINAL PASSAGE (#910) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 681 AMENDMENT # 3412 BY PEACOCK HB 681 BY ORTEGO (#904) (Y: 11 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 681 FINAL PASSAGE (#437) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 681 FINAL PASSAGE (#910) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 681 AMENDMENT # 3412 BY PEACOCK HB 681 BY ORTEGO (#904) (Y: 11 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 681 FINAL PASSAGE (#437) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | House | Effective date: January 1, 2014. |
2013-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 427. |
2013-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 9, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2013-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Called from the calendar. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/4/2013. |
2013-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2013. |
2013-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-04-16 | House | Read by title. |