LA HB69 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the collection of additional court costs in Baton Rouge City Court to fund technology enhancements (EN +$484,000 LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the collection of additional court costs in Baton Rouge City Court to fund technology enhancements (EN +$484,000 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 69 ADOPT (#1081) (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 69 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1073) (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 69 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#926) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#818) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#410) (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 69 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1073) (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 69 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#926) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#818) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - House Vote on HB 69 FINAL PASSAGE (#410) (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2015. |
2015-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 372. |
2015-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-11 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 1 nays. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-11 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 82, nays 1. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2015-06-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/11/2015. |
2015-06-10 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2015-06-09 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Nevers, Broome, and Claitor. |
2015-06-09 | House | House conferees appointed: James, Arnold, and Abramson. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2015-06-09 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2015-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015. |
2015-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-19 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 18. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-19 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2015-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2015. |
2015-05-12 | House | Notice given. |
2015-04-29 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2015-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/29/2015. |
2015-04-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2015-03-13 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/13/2015. |
2015-03-09 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2015-03-09 | House | Prefiled. |