LA HB70 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-9-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to National Guard death and disability benefits and qualifying subsequent examination (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to National Guard death and disability benefits and qualifying subsequent examination (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 70 FINAL PASSAGE (#672) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 70 2/3 vote (#671) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 70 PERMISSION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#713) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 70 FINAL PASSAGE (#330) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 70 FINAL PASSAGE (#330) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 70 2/3 vote (#671) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 70 PERMISSION TO CONSIDER AFTER 82ND DAY (#713) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 70 FINAL PASSAGE (#330) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 70 FINAL PASSAGE (#330) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2020. |
2020-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 167. |
2020-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-31 | House | Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day. |
2020-05-31 | House | By a vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. |
2020-05-20 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (17-0). |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2020-02-14 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/14/2020. |
2020-02-13 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2020-02-13 | House | Prefiled. |