LA HB740 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the assessment of penalties for failure to timely file required reports
Title
Provides relative to the assessment of penalties for failure to timely file required reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 740 FINAL PASSAGE (#364) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 19. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/2024. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2024-03-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-03-18 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |