LA HB754 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to filing fees for the Complex Litigation Section Pilot Program in the 19th JDC (EG +$120,000 LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to filing fees for the Complex Litigation Section Pilot Program in the 19th JDC (EG +$120,000 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 754 FINAL PASSAGE (#742) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2024. |
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2024-03-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-03-19 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |