LA HB868 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to standards for psychiatric hospitals and residential substance abuse facilities (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to standards for psychiatric hospitals and residential substance abuse facilities (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Egan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2024. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |