LA HB882 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to microbreweries
Title
Provides with respect to microbreweries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024. |
2024-04-29 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2024. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |