LA HB885 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Jefferson Parish Bicentennial" specialty license plate
Title
Creates the "Jefferson Parish Bicentennial" specialty license plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - House Vote on HB 885 FINAL PASSAGE (#474) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2024. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |