LA HB901 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Crime Victims Services Bureau within the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Crime Victims Services Bureau within the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024. |
2024-04-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |