LA HB932 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to purse supplements
Title
Provides relative to purse supplements
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Boyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024. |
2024-04-30 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-30 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024. |
2024-04-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |