LA HCR18 | 2011 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaims the importance of redistricting the state's congressional districts during the 2011 First Extraordinary Session of the Louisiana Legislature
Title
Proclaims the importance of redistricting the state's congressional districts during the 2011 First Extraordinary Session of the Louisiana Legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 18, ADOPT (#128) (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 18, CO-AUTHORS (#127) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 18, CO-AUTHORS (#127) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2011-04-13 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-04-13 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-04-12 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-04-12 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 25 yeas and 4 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2011-04-12 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-12 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2011-04-11 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |