LA HCR20 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 61-27-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Reported favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Reported favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Government Pension Offset and Windfall Elimination Provision
Title
Provides relative to the Government Pension Offset and Windfall Elimination Provision
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HCR 20 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#555) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2024. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2024-03-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-03-13 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |