LA HCR45 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends and extends sincere appreciation to the United States Department of Agriculture's Forest Service for its efforts, commitment to duty, and historic performance in helping confront, fight, and eradicate the spread of wildfires throughout the state of Louisiana in the summer and fall of 2023
Title
Commends and extends sincere appreciation to the United States Department of Agriculture's Forest Service for its efforts, commitment to duty, and historic performance in helping confront, fight, and eradicate the spread of wildfires throughout the state of Louisiana in the summer and fall of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Owen [R] | Rep. Dewith Carrier [R] | Rep. Mike Johnson [R] | Rep. Brett Geymann [R] |
Rep. Rodney Schamerhorn [R] | Sen. Mike Reese [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 45 CONCUR (#207) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-04-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-04-08 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |