LA HCR63 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a study concerning prevention of elder abuse
Title
Requests a study concerning prevention of elder abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HCR 63 HCR 63 BY STOKES (#926) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 63 ADOPT (#704) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HCR 63 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#531) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 63 ADOPT (#704) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HCR 63 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#531) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2019-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2019-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19. |
2019-05-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2019-05-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-06 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |