LA HCR7 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2017-18 (EN +$80,832,311 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for FY 2017-18 (EN +$80,832,311 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 7 ADOPT (#834) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on HCR 7 RECORD VOTE (#638) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on HCR 7 RECORD VOTE (#638) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-05 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title and advanced to third reading and final passage. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17. |
2017-05-31 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2017-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |