LA HCR86 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana State Law Institute to study and make recommendations for legislation to implement notaries public with limited authority
Title
Requests the Louisiana State Law Institute to study and make recommendations for legislation to implement notaries public with limited authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HCR 86 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1260) (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 86 ADOPT (#1187) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on HCR 86 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#975) (Y: 60 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 86 ADOPT (#1187) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on HCR 86 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#975) (Y: 60 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 2, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 26 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 60, nays 17. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-11 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18. |
2018-05-08 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (6-0). |
2018-05-03 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |