LA SB119 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment that provides relative to tax sales. (2/3-CA13s1(A)) (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Constitutional amendment that provides relative to tax sales. (2/3-CA13s1(A)) (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 119 FINAL PASSAGE (#281) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2024-04-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |