LA SB185 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
Pending: House Civil Law and Procedure Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in Room 4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
Pending: House Civil Law and Procedure Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 10:00 am in Room 4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for legislative continuances or extensions. (8/1/24)
Title
Provides for legislative continuances or extensions. (8/1/24)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 185 CO-AUTHORS (#352) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 185 FINAL PASSAGE (#351) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 185 FINAL PASSAGE (#351) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-04-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |