LA SB186 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Louisiana Family and Medical Leave Benefits Act. (8/1/19) (EG INCREASE SD EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Louisiana Family and Medical Leave Benefits Act. (8/1/19) (EG INCREASE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |