LA SB195 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to work requirements within the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program. (gov sig) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Title
Provides relative to work requirements within the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program. (gov sig) (RE SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Miguez [R] | Sen. Adam Bass [R] | Sen. Rick Edmonds [R] | Sen. Michael Fesi [R] |
Sen. Caleb Kleinpeter [R] | Sen. Alan Seabaugh [R] | Sen. Jeremy Stine [R] | Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 195 CO-AUTHORS (#317) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 195 FINAL PASSAGE (#316) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 195 FINAL PASSAGE (#316) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-09 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-05-08 | House | Reported favorably (9-4). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-04-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |