LA SB220 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes law enforcement to impound any vehicle used in a drag race, or other enumerated action or event, at the owner's expense, for thirty days to gather evidence pertaining to the crime. (8/1/24)
Title
Authorizes law enforcement to impound any vehicle used in a drag race, or other enumerated action or event, at the owner's expense, for thirty days to gather evidence pertaining to the crime. (8/1/24)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 220 FINAL PASSAGE (#248) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-22 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-04-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |