LA SB225 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective date 6/9/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective date 6/9/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Denham Springs to levy a hotel occupancy tax.
Title
Authorizes the city of Denham Springs to levy a hotel occupancy tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Rogers Pope [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 225 CONCUR (#919) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 225 FINAL PASSAGE (#979) (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 225 AMENDMENT # 3920 BY BEAULLIEU MOTION TO ADOPT (#978) (Y: 19 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 225 FINAL PASSAGE (#290) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 225 FINAL PASSAGE (#979) (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 225 AMENDMENT # 3920 BY BEAULLIEU MOTION TO ADOPT (#978) (Y: 19 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 225 FINAL PASSAGE (#290) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2023. |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 248. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2023-06-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2023-06-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 15. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2023. |
2023-06-01 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-31 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2023-05-30 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-22 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported with amendments (11-1). To be recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-05-15 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2023-05-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |