LA SB251 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to educational programs provided by correctional facilities. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides relative to educational programs provided by correctional facilities. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 251 CO-AUTHORS (#185) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 251 FINAL PASSAGE (#184) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 251 FINAL PASSAGE (#184) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-04-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |