LA SB295 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Received from the House with amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Received from the House with amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for rate filing procedures and requirements for rate making. (gov sig) (RE1 NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides for rate filing procedures and requirements for rate making. (gov sig) (RE1 NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House Vote on SB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#715) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Vote on SB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#715) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#158) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Vote on SB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#715) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 295 FINAL PASSAGE (#158) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2024-04-24 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 3. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-24 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2024-04-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2024. |
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |