LA SB356 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: House Labor and Industrial Relations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: House Labor and Industrial Relations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for workforce training and education initiative for public assistance recipients. (8/1/24)
Title
Provides for workforce training and education initiative for public assistance recipients. (8/1/24)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 356 FINAL PASSAGE (#202) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2024-04-04 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |