LA SB386 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to employees of the White Castle Housing Authority. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to employees of the White Castle Housing Authority. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 386 FINAL PASSAGE (#203) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-04-04 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |