LA SB6 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for continued payment of the unfunded accrued liability portion of employer contributions after participation ceases. (6/30/11) (EN ACTUARIAL SAVINGS)
Title
Provides for continued payment of the unfunded accrued liability portion of employer contributions after participation ceases. (6/30/11) (EN ACTUARIAL SAVINGS)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on SB 6, FINAL PASSAGE (#618) (Y: 57 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 6, FINAL PASSAGE (#333) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 6, FINAL PASSAGE (#278) (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 6, FINAL PASSAGE (#333) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 6, FINAL PASSAGE (#278) (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2011-06-16 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2011-06-15 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-15 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-14 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-06-14 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 28. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2011. | |
2011-06-09 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-08 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-07 | Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-06 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2011-06-02 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-06-01 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-01 | Called from the calendar. | |
2011-05-26 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2011-05-25 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | |
2011-05-25 | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 17 yeas and 19 nays. | |
2011-05-25 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-24 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Retirement. | |
2011-03-11 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Retirement. |