LA SB61 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on October 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the office of broadband and connectivity. (gov sig) (Item #39) (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the office of broadband and connectivity. (gov sig) (Item #39) (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] | Sen. Mark Abraham [R] | Sen. Troy Carter [D] | Sen. Patrick Connick [R] |
Sen. Cleo Fields [D] | Sen. Ronnie Johns [R] | Sen. John Morris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended, read by title, committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the committee on Finance. |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |