LA SB67 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Effective date 10/28/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the Department of Economic Development to provide an extension for certain job creation requirements for enterprise zone incentives and quality jobs incentive rebates due to the impacts of COVID-19, Hurricane Laura, and Hurricane Delta. (gov sig) (Items #26 and #65) (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the Department of Economic Development to provide an extension for certain job creation requirements for enterprise zone incentives and quality jobs incentive rebates due to the impacts of COVID-19, Hurricane Laura, and Hurricane Delta. (gov sig) (Items #26 and #65) (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-20 - House - House Vote on SB 67 FINAL PASSAGE (#182) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-10-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 67 FINAL PASSAGE (#120) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-28SenateEffective date 10/28/2020.
2020-10-28SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 41.
2020-10-23SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2020-10-23HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-10-21SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-10-20SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2020-10-20HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-19HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/20/20.
2020-10-19HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-19HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-19HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-10-19HouseReported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-10-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2020-10-15SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-10-14SenateRules suspended. Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-10-14SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2020-10-12SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-10-07SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-10-06SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=SB67&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191026
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191493
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192648
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193564
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194824
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191453
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191351
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192581
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192091
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191027
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191369
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191562
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191816
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192721
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192746
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194489
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1194595
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1192763
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1193529

Bill Comments

feedback