LA SCR130 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes the United States Congress to review the definition of abortion and use of the term abortion for purposes of medical records when a woman has a spontaneous miscarriage.
Title
Memorializes the United States Congress to review the definition of abortion and use of the term abortion for purposes of medical records when a woman has a spontaneous miscarriage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 130 CO-AUTHORS (#691) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 130 ADOPT (#690) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 130 ADOPT (#690) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. |
2019-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-06-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |