LA SR26 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/4/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/4/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Wednesday, April 3, 2024, as Gulf State Renewable Energy Industries Association Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Title
Designates Wednesday, April 3, 2024, as Gulf State Renewable Energy Industries Association Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/4/2024. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted. |