LA SR42 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/18/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/18/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Tuesday, April 16, 2024, as Acadiana Red and White Day at the state capitol.
Title
Recognizes Tuesday, April 16, 2024, as Acadiana Red and White Day at the state capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/18/2024. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted. |