LA SR6 | 2018 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-24 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/25/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-24 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/25/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Dr. Fred Lowery, retired pastor of First Baptist Church of Bossier City, Louisiana, and his wife, Leigh, on their dedication and faith, focusing especially on their longtime marriage and on his more than 50 years of preaching God's word.
Title
Commends Dr. Fred Lowery, retired pastor of First Baptist Church of Bossier City, Louisiana, and his wife, Leigh, on their dedication and faith, focusing especially on their longtime marriage and on his more than 50 years of preaching God's word.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/25/2018. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |