MA H1100 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5160
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require insurance companies to reimburse licensed athletic trainers for certain services. Financial Services.
Title
Promoting consumer choice in health care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5160 |
2019-06-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H901 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H903 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1563 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1084 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S598 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S661 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H795 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H903 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1563 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1084 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S598 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S558 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S661 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H795 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5160 (Replaced by) 2020-12-01 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1100 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1100.pdf |