MA H1137 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to access to full spectrum pregnancy care. Financial Services.
Title
Ensuring access to full spectrum pregnancy care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-04-28 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-04-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1790 (Similar To) 2023-12-12 - Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1150 (Similar To) 2023-04-28 - Hearing rescheduled to 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1277 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4268
H3685 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H4268 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1150 (Similar To) 2023-04-28 - Hearing rescheduled to 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1277 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4268
H3685 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H4268 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1137 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1137.pdf |