MA H3685 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to ensuring solar energy access. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Ensuring solar energy access
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Cutler [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Aaron Saunders [D] |
Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. Priscila Sousa [D] | Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H1790 (Similar To) 2023-12-12 - Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1150 (Similar To) 2023-04-28 - Hearing rescheduled to 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1137 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1277 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4268
H4268 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1150 (Similar To) 2023-04-28 - Hearing rescheduled to 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1137 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H1277 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4268
H4268 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3685 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3685.pdf |