MA H1302 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to manufactured housing. Housing.
Title
Relative to manufactured housing
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-04-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-04-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-03-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-03-04 | House | No further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H1381 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1302 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1302.pdf |